Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB624 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: May 12 2023 12:02AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Referred to Human Services: May 15 2023 4:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/20/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 20 2023 1:01AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/23/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
03/30/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/29/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/29/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/30/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/06/2023 10:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 24 2023 12:11PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23