Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1502
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended
|
1-C.J. Harris
|
Journal Page: 2586
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 337
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|