Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis April 25, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023