Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3108 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1106 | Journal Page: 3107 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Amended | 1-Romero | Journal Page: 3107 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1069 | Journal Page: 3041 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 3041 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1304 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Community Safety, Select | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |