E
|
06/10/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/10/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5896
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4981
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1033
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1033
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1413
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#180
|
Journal Page: 1413
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1413
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1413
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 813
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1033
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 343
|
House
|
11/15/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|