Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 20, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023