House | 04/28/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2353 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1052 | Journal Page: 2353 |
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 11/15/2022 | Filed |