Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB729 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/16/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
04/05/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/04/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
04/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
03/14/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Considered in Calendars