Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB768 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/07/2023 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars