Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1315 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#470 | Journal Page: 1963 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1918 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended | 2-Canales | Journal Page: 1918 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1917 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1357 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 363 | |
House | 11/22/2022 | Filed |