Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB790 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2022
Bill December 1, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note March 19, 2023