LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB81
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB81
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/20/2023
8:00 am
Public Health Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 120
HB44
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB81
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1106
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1313
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1890
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1998
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2726
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB2767
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services