Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB824 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2022
Bill November 29, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 19, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023