House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5288
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2681
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2423
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 2423
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2423
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2423
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2425
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#349
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote RV#349
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#331
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
12/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|