Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB890 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2022
Bill December 7, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023