Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1035 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1543 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#236 | Journal Page: 1542 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1542 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1542 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1513 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#219 | Journal Page: 1512 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1512 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Amended | 1-Cain | Journal Page: 1512 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1512 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1344 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 12/07/2022 | Filed |