Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB916 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2022
Bill December 8, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 8, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023