Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB916 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 916


 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit plan coverage of prescription
 contraceptive drugs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1369.102, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1369.102.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER.  Except as
 otherwise provided by this subchapter, this [This] subchapter
 applies only to a health benefit plan, including a small employer
 health benefit plan written under Chapter 1501, that provides
 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or an individual or
 group evidence of coverage or similar coverage document that is
 offered by:
 (1)  an insurance company;
 (2)  a group hospital service corporation operating
 under Chapter 842;
 (3)  a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (4)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (5)  a reciprocal exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 (6)  a health maintenance organization operating under
 Chapter 843;
 (7)  a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
 (8)  an approved nonprofit health corporation that
 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1369.1031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1369.1031.  CERTAIN COVERAGE REQUIRED. (a)  This
 section applies to a health benefit plan described by Section
 1369.102.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, this section applies to:
 (1)  a standard health benefit plan issued under
 Chapter 1507;
 (2)  a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
 (3)  a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
 (4)  a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
 (5)  a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
 1601;
 (6)  group health coverage made available by a school
 district in accordance with Section 22.004, Education Code; and
 (7)  the state Medicaid program, including the Medicaid
 managed care program operated under Chapter 533, Government Code.
 (c)  A health benefit plan that provides benefits for a
 prescription contraceptive drug must provide for an enrollee to
 obtain up to:
 (1)  a three-month supply of the covered prescription
 contraceptive drug at one time the first time the enrollee obtains
 the drug; and
 (2)  a 12-month supply of the covered prescription
 contraceptive drug at one time each subsequent time the enrollee
 obtains the same drug, regardless of whether the enrollee was
 enrolled in the health benefit plan the first time the enrollee
 obtained the drug.
 (d)  An enrollee may obtain only one 12-month supply of a
 covered prescription contraceptive drug during each 12-month
 period.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2024. A health benefit plan that is
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2024,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 916 was passed by the House on April
 18, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 9, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 916 on May 19, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 3, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 916 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor