House | 05/05/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3169 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 294 | Journal Page: 3169 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 12/08/2022 | Filed |