Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB924 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/29/2023 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Failed to pass to engrossment
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence