LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB93
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB93
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB93
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/16/2023
8:00 am
Corrections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.014
HB93
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Considered in Calendars
HB252
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB353
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Failed to pass to engrossment
HB361
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Received from the House
HB517
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB607
Introduced
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H No action taken in committee
HB786
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Education
HB965
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
HB1227
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1743
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1747
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB1832
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1914
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1446
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs