Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 970 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Record vote | RV#199 | Journal Page: 1472 |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |