E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4999 | |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3714 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3066 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3212 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2913 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1542 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1412 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2347 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2347 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Filed |