E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5303 | |
E | 05/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4221 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3711 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1696 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 2043 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Filed |