E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5303 | |
E | 05/22/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5143 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2350 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
House | 05/21/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4998 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4834 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2070 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4567 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4567 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Filed |