E | 03/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 923 | |
E | 03/16/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 432 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 730 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 731 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 662 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 529 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#45 | Journal Page: 529 |
House | 03/08/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 372 | |
House | 01/12/2023 | Filed |