E | 06/11/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/26/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5976 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2994 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5614 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5303 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4990 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2319 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2319 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2319 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2319 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2242 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2236 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1486 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1486 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1411 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Record vote | RV#674 | Journal Page: 2368 |
House | 04/28/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 430 | |
House | 01/17/2023 | Filed |