Senate | 05/19/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2145 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#1839 | Journal Page: 4622 |
House | 05/19/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4622 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4622 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4564 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 430 | |
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed |