LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HCR47
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HCR47
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR47
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/17/2023
9:00 am
Appropriations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.030
HCR47
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
HJR27
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
HJR111
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB881
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB963
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Transportation
HB1392
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB2207
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB2230
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3345
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3461
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
HB4041
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23