E | 04/14/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1530 | |
E | 04/06/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1304 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 802 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1046 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 698 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 966 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 966 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Filed |