E | 05/05/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3346 | |
E | 04/25/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2196 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1232 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1073 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Filed |