E | 04/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2049 | |
E | 04/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1449 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 880 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1303 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1304 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1285 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1015 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1015 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 943 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Filed |