E | 04/28/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2578 | |
E | 04/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 993 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1026 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1026 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 943 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Filed |