E | 05/13/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4318 | |
E | 05/02/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2915 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1422 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2190 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 976 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 1041 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Filed |