Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR102 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 05/11/2023

                            By: Leach, Meyer, Patterson, Moody, Canales H.J.R. No. 102


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to legalize wagering in this state on certain sporting events and
 requiring the legislature to dedicate to property tax relief at
 least 98 percent of the net state tax revenue generated from the
 wagering on sporting events.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (f) and
 (g) to read as follows:
 (a)  The Legislature shall pass laws prohibiting lotteries
 and gift enterprises in this State other than those authorized by
 Subsections (b), (d), (d-1), [and] (e), (f), and (g) of this
 section.
 (f)  The legislature by law may authorize and regulate the
 placing of wagers on sporting events. A law enacted under this
 subsection may authorize the conduct of sports wagering only by:
 (1)  a sports team, as defined by general law;
 (2)  a sports organization that held in this state
 before January 1, 2023, sanctioned annual professional golf
 tournaments as part of a national tour of professional golfers;
 (3)  a class 1 horse racetrack in operation on January
 1, 2023;
 (4)  a racetrack that:
 (A)  existed and operated before January 1, 2000;
 and
 (B)  annually hosted National Association for
 Stock Car Auto Racing Cup Series events for at least 20 years
 preceding May 1, 2023; or
 (5)  a designee of an entity described by Subdivisions
 (1)-(4) of this subsection.
 (g)  A law enacted under Subsection (f) of this section must
 dedicate to property tax relief at least 98 percent of the net state
 tax revenue generated from wagering on sports events.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to legalize wagering in this state on certain sporting
 events and requiring the legislature to dedicate to property tax
 relief at least 98 percent of the net state tax revenue generated
 from the wagering on sporting events."