Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Witness List
Analysis
Bill

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 8, 2023