E
|
05/08/2023
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 3714
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1636
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3212
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Point of order sustained
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1193
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1193
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#121
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1193
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|