Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR126 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note
Bill

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Senate Committee Report

Bill
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023