Senate | 04/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 862 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1292 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#120 | Journal Page: 1291 |
House | 04/10/2023 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 1291 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Amended | 1-Toth | Journal Page: 1291 |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1291 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 555 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 555 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |