Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2023
Bill
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill

Analysis

Analysis March 31, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 19, 2023