Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1758 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3795 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1453 | Journal Page: 3794 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 690 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |