Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3398 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1271 | Journal Page: 3397 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3397 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3397 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |