Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1060 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1060


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, All who shared in the life of Maria Adela Saenz of
 Donna were deeply saddened by her death on March 27, 2023, at the
 age of 77; and
 WHEREAS, Maria Saenz was born to Didaco and Rafaela
 Villarreal on May 29, 1945, and she grew up in Edinburg with eight
 siblings, Rebecca, Dora, Zeferino, Roberto, Guadalupe Bertha,
 Paula, Amada, and Gregoria; and
 WHEREAS, On April 24, 1966, this beloved woman married
 Gilberto Saenz; Mrs. Saenz was a devoted mother to her four
 children, Sarah, Homer, Gilbert, and Nadia, and with the passing
 years, she had the privilege of welcoming into her family 10
 grandchildren, Jamie, Meriah, J. J., Sydney, Noelle, Gilbert,
 David, Sophia, Noah, and Caleb, and a great-grandchild, Eric; and
 WHEREAS, Admired for her warmth, dedication, and strength of
 character, Maria Saenz brightened the world for all who knew her,
 and they will forever hold her close in their hearts; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Maria Adela Saenz
 and extend sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her
 husband, Judge Gilberto Saenz; to her children, Sarah Pena, Homer
 Saenz, and Nadia Medrano; to her grandchildren, Jamie, Meriah, and
 J. J. Pena, Sydney, Noelle, Gilbert, David, and Sophia Saenz, and
 Noah and Caleb Medrano; to her great-grandchild, Eric; to her
 sisters, Rebecca Oliveros and Dora Villarreal; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Maria
 Saenz.
 Martinez
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1060 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 20, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House