Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1064 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1064


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The memory of Linda Anne Hoffman of Plano, who
 passed away on July 17, 2022, at the age of 79, is being honored at
 the Carrollton Women's Club Spring Luncheon on April 13, 2023; and
 WHEREAS, The youngest child of John and Pauline O'Grady,
 Linda Hoffman was born in Billings, Oklahoma, on July 19, 1942, and
 she grew up with the companionship of six siblings, Margaret, Pat,
 Olivia, Eddie, Bert, and Gerald; she went on to marry the love of
 her life, Leon Hoffman, and together they made their home in such
 cities as Dallas, Houston, and Austin, before settling in
 Carrollton, where they spent more than three decades; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Hoffman enjoyed a rewarding career working as a
 secretary in various school districts throughout the State of
 Texas, and she eventually retired from the Dallas College
 Brookhaven Campus; and
 WHEREAS, An engaged citizen, Mrs. Hoffman was a longtime
 member of the Carrollton Women's Club, a service-oriented
 organization that benefits the community by raising money for local
 charities and for scholarships for area high school girls; over the
 course of her 24-year membership with the club, she served in
 numerous leadership roles, including as president,
 parliamentarian, recording secretary, and corresponding secretary;
 several years before her passing, she became a resident of the
 Conservatory At Plano, where she served as an ambassador and on the
 resident council; and
 WHEREAS, This beloved woman was a devoted mother to her two
 children, Gary and Sheri, and through the years, she had the
 pleasure of welcoming into her family four grandchildren, Ryan,
 Alyssa, Jacob, and Maggie, as well as a great-granddaughter, Hazel;
 in her leisure time, she enjoyed reading, quilting, solving
 crossword puzzles, and playing games with her grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to her family and her community,
 Linda Hoffman made a meaningful difference in the lives of her loved
 ones and fellow citizens alike, and her contributions will be
 fondly remembered for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Linda Anne Hoffman and
 honor her longtime service to the Carrollton Women's Club; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Linda
 Hoffman.
 Thimesch
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1064 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 20, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House