House | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3218 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3218 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Filed |