Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1330 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/12/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1330


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life lived with joy and purpose drew to a close
 with the passing of Mary Elizabeth White Hooten on March 24, 2023,
 at the age of 75; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Dorothy Jean Arp and O. B. White Jr.,
 the former Mary White was born on January 6, 1948, in Bell County
 and grew up with the companionship of a brother, Jack; she graduated
 from Belton High School with the Class of 1966 and continued her
 education at Southwest Texas State University, where she pledged
 Delta Zeta and served as student council treasurer; and
 WHEREAS, On January 31, 1969, she married Doug Hooten, and
 they became the proud parents of two daughters, Lauren and Amy; with
 the passing years, Mrs. Hooten had the pleasure of welcoming into
 her treasured family three grandchildren, Noah, Angela, and Kenley;
 and
 WHEREAS, In addition to working as a special education
 instructor at Southwest Elementary School in Belton, Mrs. Hooten
 devoted herself to raising her children, driving them to and from
 various activities, sewing costumes for school plays, and hosting
 youth group gatherings; moreover, she gave back to the community as
 a volunteer with the Junior League; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Hooten and her husband lived in England and
 Richmond, Virginia, before moving to Austin to be closer to their
 daughters; an avid traveler, Mrs. Hooten visited locations across
 Europe as well as Jerusalem, Egypt, China, Russia, Peru, and
 Antarctica; known for her culinary skills, she earned an honorary
 degree from Le Cordon Bleu, and she was also a talented seamstress
 and embroiderer; and
 WHEREAS, Although Mary Hooten will be deeply missed, those
 who held her dear will forever remember the warmth and kindness she
 brought into their lives; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Mary Elizabeth
 White Hooten and extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Mary
 Hooten.
 Harris of Williamson
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1330 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 12, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House