House | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4965 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Record vote | RV#1972 | Journal Page: 4964 |
House | 05/23/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4964 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4964 | |
House | 05/20/2023 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 2787 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Filed |