Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1354 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/12/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:30PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:27PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:24PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:13PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:08PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:12PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:11PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:46PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:50AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:34AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:56PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:56PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:30PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:30PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:30PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:56PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Signed by the Governor