1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 1388 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Citizens of Uvalde lost two beloved residents with |
---|
6 | 6 | | the tragic passing of Irma Linda Garcia on May 24, 2022, at the age |
---|
7 | 7 | | of 48, and her husband, Jose Antonio Garcia, on May 26, 2022, at the |
---|
8 | 8 | | age of 50; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia formed a strong and lasting bond |
---|
10 | 10 | | of devotion during the 25 years they shared as husband and wife; |
---|
11 | 11 | | they were high school sweethearts who went on to exchange wedding |
---|
12 | 12 | | vows in Uvalde on June 28, 1997, and they took immense joy in |
---|
13 | 13 | | raising their four children, Lyliana, Alysandra, Cristian, and |
---|
14 | 14 | | Jose; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Born in San Antonio on December 11, 1973, Irma |
---|
16 | 16 | | Garcia was the daughter of Manuel Z. Lozano and Olga Salazar; she |
---|
17 | 17 | | grew up with the companionship of two sisters, Velma and Marissa, |
---|
18 | 18 | | and a brother, Marcus; after receiving her bachelor's degree in |
---|
19 | 19 | | interdisciplinary studies from Sul Ross State University in 1997, |
---|
20 | 20 | | she embarked on a 23-year career as an elementary teacher with the |
---|
21 | 21 | | Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District; she found great |
---|
22 | 22 | | fulfillment in engaging with her students and helping to set them on |
---|
23 | 23 | | a path toward higher education; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | WHEREAS, Joe Garcia was born in Uvalde on April 18, 1972, and |
---|
25 | 25 | | was raised by his mother, Maria Garcia, along with his three |
---|
26 | 26 | | siblings, Armando, Maria, and Antonio; for more than three decades, |
---|
27 | 27 | | he was employed with H-E-B, where he rose from produce stocker to a |
---|
28 | 28 | | position in management; throughout his career, he was admired by |
---|
29 | 29 | | his colleagues for his work ethic and his drive to ensure that every |
---|
30 | 30 | | task was done the right way; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia shared an unwavering commitment |
---|
32 | 32 | | to their family, to their community, and to one another, and the |
---|
33 | 33 | | couple will forever remain a source of inspiration to all who were |
---|
34 | 34 | | fortunate enough to know them; now, therefore, be it |
---|
35 | 35 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas |
---|
36 | 36 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Irma Linda and Jose |
---|
37 | 37 | | Antonio Garcia and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of |
---|
38 | 38 | | their family: to their children, Lyliana Analise Garcia, Alysandra |
---|
39 | 39 | | Celeste Garcia, Cristian Antonio Garcia, and Jose Alejandro Garcia; |
---|
40 | 40 | | to Mrs. Garcia's father, Manuel Z. Lozano, and her siblings, Velma |
---|
41 | 41 | | Lisa Duran, Marissa Lozano, and Marcus Lozano; to Mr. Garcia's |
---|
42 | 42 | | siblings, Maria G. Esparza and Armando P. Garcia; to the couple's |
---|
43 | 43 | | other relatives and friends; and to the countless others in Uvalde |
---|
44 | 44 | | and beyond who mourn their passing; and, be it further |
---|
45 | 45 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
46 | 46 | | prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
47 | 47 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Irma and |
---|
48 | 48 | | Joe Garcia. |
---|
49 | 49 | | King of Uvalde |
---|
50 | 50 | | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | 51 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
52 | 52 | | I certify that H.R. No. 1388 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
53 | 53 | | rising vote of the House on May 2, 2023. |
---|
54 | 54 | | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | 55 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|