H.R. No. 1388 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Citizens of Uvalde lost two beloved residents with the tragic passing of Irma Linda Garcia on May 24, 2022, at the age of 48, and her husband, Jose Antonio Garcia, on May 26, 2022, at the age of 50; and WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia formed a strong and lasting bond of devotion during the 25 years they shared as husband and wife; they were high school sweethearts who went on to exchange wedding vows in Uvalde on June 28, 1997, and they took immense joy in raising their four children, Lyliana, Alysandra, Cristian, and Jose; and WHEREAS, Born in San Antonio on December 11, 1973, Irma Garcia was the daughter of Manuel Z. Lozano and Olga Salazar; she grew up with the companionship of two sisters, Velma and Marissa, and a brother, Marcus; after receiving her bachelor's degree in interdisciplinary studies from Sul Ross State University in 1997, she embarked on a 23-year career as an elementary teacher with the Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District; she found great fulfillment in engaging with her students and helping to set them on a path toward higher education; and WHEREAS, Joe Garcia was born in Uvalde on April 18, 1972, and was raised by his mother, Maria Garcia, along with his three siblings, Armando, Maria, and Antonio; for more than three decades, he was employed with H-E-B, where he rose from produce stocker to a position in management; throughout his career, he was admired by his colleagues for his work ethic and his drive to ensure that every task was done the right way; and WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia shared an unwavering commitment to their family, to their community, and to one another, and the couple will forever remain a source of inspiration to all who were fortunate enough to know them; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Irma Linda and Jose Antonio Garcia and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of their family: to their children, Lyliana Analise Garcia, Alysandra Celeste Garcia, Cristian Antonio Garcia, and Jose Alejandro Garcia; to Mrs. Garcia's father, Manuel Z. Lozano, and her siblings, Velma Lisa Duran, Marissa Lozano, and Marcus Lozano; to Mr. Garcia's siblings, Maria G. Esparza and Armando P. Garcia; to the couple's other relatives and friends; and to the countless others in Uvalde and beyond who mourn their passing; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Irma and Joe Garcia. King of Uvalde ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1388 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 2, 2023. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House